Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1001 Today
» 1155 Yesterday
» 4408 Week
» 29210 Month
» 258174 Year
» 334761 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Classes with Wheel Arrangement 2-8-2

Designer Class Pre Grouping Class Wheels Year Pre Grouping Big 4 BR Power Class Number Range First Last # Thumbnail
Gresley P1   2-8-2 1925   LNER   2392 - 2394 27/06/1925 24/07/1945 2
Gresley P2   2-8-2 1934   LNER     22/05/1934 03/07/1961 6