Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 522 Today
» 1035 Yesterday
» 6947 Week
» 21255 Month
» 284232 Year
» 360819 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Classes with Wheel Arrangement 2-8-0

Designer Class Pre Grouping Class Wheels Year Pre Grouping Big 4 BR Power Class Number Range First Last # Thumbnail
  WD/8   2-8-0     WD   90000 - 90732 01/1943 01/1973 935
Churchward 28xx   2-8-0 1903   GWR   2800 - 3866 06/1903 11/1965 167
Churchward 47xx   2-8-0 1919   GWR   4700 - 4708 05/1919 05/1964 9
Fowler 7F S&DJR class '5P5G' 2-8-0 1914 S&DJR LMS   53800 - 53810 02/1914 05/09/1964 11
Robinson ROD   2-8-0     GWR   3002 - 3049     0
Stanier 8F   2-8-0     LMS   48000 - 48775 06/1935 04/08/1968 666
Webb/Whale Rebuilt Compound   2-8-0 1904 LNWR LMS         0
Webb/Whale Rebuilt Compound   2-8-0 1906 LNWR LMS         0
Robinson O1   2-8-0 1944   LNER   63578 - 63901     0
Gresley O2   2-8-0 1918 GNR LNER 8F 63921 - 63987 05/1918 03/11/1963 67
Gresley O3 GNR class 'O1' 2-8-0 1913 GNR LNER   63475 - 63494 12/1913 16/12/1952 20
Robinson O4 GCR class '8K' 2-8-0 1911 GCR LNER   63570 - 63920 09/1911 17/04/1966 402
Robinson O5 GCR class '8M' 2-8-0 1918 GCR LNER     01/1918 06/06/1965 19