Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 652 Today
» 838 Yesterday
» 4893 Week
» 21842 Month
» 136103 Year
» 1020484 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Classes with Wheel Arrangement 2-6-4T

Designer Class Pre Grouping Class Wheels Year Pre Grouping Big 4 BR Power Class Number Range First Last # Thumbnail
Robinson L3 GCR class '1B' 2-6-4T 1914 GCR LNER   69050 - 69069 12/1914 07/07/1955 20
Hally L2   2-6-4T 1925 MET LNER   69070 - 69071 21/03/1925 22/10/1948 6
Fowler 4P   2-6-4T 1927   LMS   42300 - 42424 09/12/1927 09/1966 125
Maunsell W   2-6-4T 1931   SR   31911 - 31925 01/1932 08/1964 15
Stanier 4P   2-6-4T 1934   LMS   42500 - 42536 06/03/1934 18/06/1962 37
Stanier 4P   2-6-4T 1935   LMS   42425 - 42672 09/12/1935 10/1967 206
Fairburn 4P   2-6-4T 1945   LMS   42050 - 42699 28/03/1945 10/1967 277
Thompson L1   2-6-4T 1945   LNER   67701 - 67800 05/1945 29/12/1962 100
Riddles Standard Class 4 Tank   2-6-4T 1951       80000 - 80154 10/07/1951 09/07/1967 155