Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 808 Today
» 1022 Yesterday
» 808 Week
» 26590 Month
» 224107 Year
» 300694 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Classes with Wheel Arrangement 2-6-2T

Designer Class Pre Grouping Class Wheels Year Pre Grouping Big 4 BR Power Class Number Range First Last # Thumbnail
  VR   2-6-2T 1923   GWR   7 - 9 07/1923   3
  Unclassified ANDR class 'Unclass' 2-6-2T 1920 ANDR GWR   1205 - 1206 01/1921 01/1956 2
Churchward 45xx   2-6-2T 1906   GWR   4500 - 4574 10/1906 09/1964 75
Churchward 3150   2-6-2T 1906   GWR   3150 - 3190 04/1906 08/1958 41
Churchward 3100/5100   2-6-2T 1903   GWR   5111 - 5148 01/1905 12/1959 40
Churchward 44xx   2-6-2T 1904   GWR   4400 - 4410 10/1904 09/1955 11
Collett 31xx   2-6-2T 1906   GWR   3100 - 3104 12/1938 01/1960 0
Collett 61xx   2-6-2T 1931   GWR   6100 - 6169 04/1931 03/12/1965 70
Collett 4575   2-6-2T 1927   GWR   4575 - 5574 02/1927 12/1964 100
Collett 81xx   2-6-2T 1938   GWR   8100 - 8109 03/1938 06/1965 0
Collett 5101   2-6-2T 1929   GWR   4100 - 5199 11/1929 18/11/1965 140
Dean 39xx   2-6-2T 1907   GWR   3901 - 3920 02/1907   0
Fowler 3P   2-6-2T     LMS   40001 - 40070 17/03/1930 15/12/1962 70
Ivatt 2MT   2-6-2T     LMS 2MT 41200 - 41329 12/1946 07/1967 130
Stanier 3P   2-6-2T     LMS   40071 - 40209 15/02/1935 29/12/1962 139
Gresley V1   2-6-2T 1930   LNER   67601 - 67680 09/1930 11/1964 82
Gresley V3   2-6-2T 1939   LNER 4MT 67600 - 67691 09/1939 11/1964 10
Riddles Standard Class 3 Tank   2-6-2T 1952       82000 - 82044 04/04/1952 09/07/1967 45
Riddles Standard Class 2 Tank   2-6-2T 1953       84000 - 84029 04/07/1953 11/12/1965 30