Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1030 Today
» 1236 Yesterday
» 6001 Week
» 20578 Month
» 383823 Year
» 460410 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Classes with Wheel Arrangement 2-6-2

Designer Class Pre Grouping Class Wheels Year Pre Grouping Big 4 BR Power Class Number Range First Last # Thumbnail
Gresley V2   2-6-2 1936   LNER   60800 - 60983 13/06/1936 31/12/1966 184
Gresley V4   2-6-2 1941   LNER   61700 - 61701 25/02/1941 26/11/1957 2