Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 792 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 2653 Week
» 23635 Month
» 165589 Year
» 1049970 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Classes with Wheel Arrangement 0-4-4T

Designer Class Pre Grouping Class Wheels Year Pre Grouping Big 4 BR Power Class Number Range First Last # Thumbnail
Kirtley 690 MR class '690' 0-4-4T 1869 MR LMS     06/1869 08/1934 6
Kirtley 780 MR class '780' 0-4-4T 1870 MR LMS     1870 11/1935 20
Johnson 6 MR class '6' 0-4-4T 1875 MR LMS 1P   06/1875 31/12/1938 10
Johnson 1262 MR class '1262' 0-4-4T 1875 MR LMS 1P 58030 - 58038 11/1875 19/06/1954 30
Johnson 1P   0-4-4T 1876   LMS   58039 - 58091 04/1876 07/1960 56
Fletcher G6   0-4-4T 1876 NER LNER     04/1874   124
Drummond G8   0-4-4T 1877 NBR LNER     06/1877 09/1925 6
Smellie 1 GSWR class '1' 0-4-4T 1879 GSWR LMS         4
Johnson 1532 MR class '1532' 0-4-4T 1881 MR LMS 1P   08/1881 31/10/1959 115
Stirling G2   0-4-4T 1881 GNR LNER     10/1881 04/1926 16
Drummond 171 CR class '171 Rbld' 0-4-4T 1884 CR LMS 1P       24
Drummond 171 CR class '171' 0-4-4T 1884 CR LMS 1P       24
Holmes G7   0-4-4T 1886   LNER         12
Adams T1 LSWR class 'T1' 0-4-4T 1888 LSWR SR   30001 - 30367 06/1888 05/1951 50
Adams O2 LSWR class 'O2' 0-4-4T 1889 LSWR SR 1P 30177 - 30236 12/1889 03/1967 60
Stirling G1   0-4-4T 1889 GNR LNER     12/1889 02/1927 29
  Bob Tails   0-4-4T 1891   SR   31658 - 31675 09/1891 12/1955 15
Billinton Bogie Tanks   0-4-4T 1892   SR   32364 - 32398 06/1892 10/1955 28
Manson 326 GSWR class '326' 0-4-4T 1893 GSWR LMS 1P   10/1893 1932 10
Manson 326 GSWR class '326 Ext' 0-4-4T 1893 GSWR LMS 1P   10/1893 1932 10
Johnson G10   0-4-4T 1893 GNSR LNER     11/1893 08/1947 9
Worsdell G5   0-4-4T 1894 NER LNER   67240 - 67349 05/1894 12/1958 110
Johnson 2228 MR class '2228' 0-4-4T 1895 MR LMS 1P   02/1895 13/08/1960 50
Lambie 19 CR class '19' 0-4-4T 1895 CR LMS 2P       10
Marsh D3X   0-4-4T 1896   SR   32397 11/1896 07/1948 1
Maryport Works 26 MCR class '26' 0-4-4T 1897 MCR LMS         1
Kitson G3   0-4-4T 1897 GCR LNER         6
Drummond Motor Tanks LSWR class 'M7' 0-4-4T 1897 LSWR SR   30021 - 30676 03/1897 05/1964 104
McIntosh 92 CR class '92' 0-4-4T 1897 CR LMS 2P       12
Holden G4   0-4-4T 1898 GER LNER     12/1898 12/1938 40
McIntosh 104 CR class '104' 0-4-4T 1899 CR LMS 1P       12
  R1   0-4-4T 1900   SR   31696 - 31710 11/1900 04/1956 13
McIntosh 439 CR class '439' 0-4-4T 1900 CR LMS 2P       78
McIntosh 439 CR class '439 Y114' 0-4-4T 1900 CR LMS 2P       78
McIntosh 879 CR class '879' 0-4-4T 1900 CR LMS 2P       10
McIntosh 439 CR class '439 Y130' 0-4-4T 1900 CR LMS 2P       78
McIntosh 439 CR class '439 Y77' 0-4-4T 1900 CR LMS 2P       78
Wainwright H   0-4-4T 1904   SR   31005 - 31554 11/1904 01/1964 64
Drummond W   0-4-4T 1905 HR LMS     03/1905 01/1957 4
Drummond Passenger Tank   0-4-4T 1905 HR LMS 0F 55051 - 55053 03/1905 16/01/1957 2
Manson 266 GSWR class '266' 0-4-4T 1906 GSWR LMS     05/1906 11/1932 6
Adams 9 NSR class '9' 0-4-4T 1907 NSR LMS         5
Reid G9   0-4-4T 1909 NBR LNER     09/1909 11/1940 12
Adams/Connor 15 NSR class '15' 0-4-4T 1920 NSR LMS         4
Pickersgill 431 CR class '431' 0-4-4T 1922 CR LMS 2P       4
McIntosh 2P CR class '2P' 0-4-4T 1925 CR LMS   55260 - 55269 05/1925 29/12/1962 10
Stanier 2P   0-4-4T 1932   LMS   41900 - 41909 12/1932 03/1962 10