Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 260 Today
» 1259 Yesterday
» 1519 Week
» 22186 Month
» 353675 Year
» 430262 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Classes of the Great Central Railway

Designer Class Pre Grouping Class Wheels Year Pre Grouping Big 4 BR Power Class Number Range First Last # Thumbnail
Robinson A5 GCR class '9N' 4-6-2T 1911 GCR LNER 4P 69800 - 69842 18/03/1911 17/11/1960 44
Robinson B3 GCR class '9P' 4-6-0 1917 GCR LNER   61497 11/1917 14/04/1949 6
Robinson B4 GCR class '8F' 4-6-0 1906 GCR LNER 4P 61482 - 61488 06/1906 24/11/1950 10
Robinson B5 GCR class '8' 4-6-0 1902 GCR LNER 3MT 61680 - 61690 11/1902 12/06/1950 14
Robinson B6 GCR class '8N' 4-6-0 1918 GCR LNER     07/1918 31/12/1947 3
Robinson B7 GCR class '9Q' 4-6-0 1921 GCR LNER 6MT 61360 - 61397 05/1921 03/07/1950 38
Robinson B8 GCR class '1A' 4-6-0 1913 GCR LNER   61353 - 61358 06/1913 23/04/1949 11
Robinson B9 GCR class '8G' 4-6-0 1906 GCR LNER 5MT 61469 - 61476 09/1906 16/05/1949 10
Robinson B18 GCR class '8C' 4-6-0 1903 GCR LNER n/a   12/1903 31/12/1947 2
Robinson B19 GCR class 'I' 4-6-0 1912 GCR LNER     12/1912 14/11/1947 6
Robinson C4 GCR class '8B' 4-4-2 1903 GCR LNER 2P 62902 - 62924 12/1903 02/12/1950 27
Robinson C5 GCR class '8D' 4-4-2 1905 GCR LNER         4
Robinson C5 GCR class '8E' 4-4-2 1905 GCR LNER         4
Robinson C13 GCR class '9K' 4-4-2T 1903 GCR LNER 2P 67400 - 67439 03/1903 01/1960 40
Robinson C14 GCR class '9L' 4-4-2T 1907 GCR LNER 2P 67440 - 67451 05/1907 01/1960 12
Pollitt D5 GCR class '11' 4-4-0 1895 GCR LNER     07/1895 03/1933 6
Pollitt D6 GCR class '11A' 4-4-0 1897 GCR LNER     09/1897 12/1947 33
Parker D7   4-4-0 1887 MSLR LNER     11/1887 12/1939 31
Parker D8 MSLR class '6DB' 4-4-0 1888 MSLR LNER     07/1888 03/1926 3
Robinson D9 GCR class '11C' 4-4-0 1901 GCR LNER   62300 - 62333 10/1901 07/1950 40
Robinson D9 GCR class '11D' 4-4-0 1901 GCR LNER   62300 - 62333 10/1901 07/1950 40
Robinson D9 GCR class '11B' 4-4-0 1901 GCR LNER   62300 - 62333 10/1901 07/1950 40
Robinson D10 GCR class '11E' 4-4-0 1913 GCR LNER   62650 - 62659 08/1913 08/10/1955 10
Robinson Large/Scottish Director GCR class '11F' 4-4-0 1919 GCR LNER   62660 - 62694 12/1919 15/01/1962 35
Sacré D12 GCR class '6B' 4-4-0 1877 GCR LNER         0
Sacré E8   2-4-0T 1881 MSJAR LNER         0
Parker F1 MSLR class '3 Alt.' 2-4-2T 1889 MSLR LNER 1P 67097 - 67100 06/1889 01/1949 39
Parker F1 MSLR class '3' 2-4-2T 1889 MSLR LNER 1P 67097 - 67100 06/1889 01/1949 39
Pollitt F2 GCR class '9G' 2-4-2T 1898 GCR LNER 1P 67104 - 67113 04/1898 12/1950 10
Kitson G3   0-4-4T 1897 GCR LNER         6
Robinson J11 GCR class '9J' 0-6-0 1901 GCR LNER   64280 - 64453 09/1901 21/10/1962 174
Parker J13 MSLR class '9' 0-6-0 1889 MSLR LNER     01/1889 11/1935 6
  J60   0-6-0T 1897 GCR LNER   68366 - 68368 02/1897 03/08/1948 4
Pollitt J62   0-6-0ST 1897 MSLR LNER 0F 68200 - 68203 01/1897 11/1951 12
Robinson J63 GCR class '5A' 0-6-0T 1906 GCR LNER 0F 68204 - 68210 08/1906 25/02/1957 7
Robinson L3 GCR class '1B' 2-6-4T 1914 GCR LNER   69050 - 69069 12/1914 07/07/1955 20
Markham M1 LDECR class 'D' 0-6-4T 1904 LDECR LNER     05/1904 04/07/1947 9
Parker N4   0-6-2T 1889 MSLR LNER 2MT 69225 - 69241 12/1889 03/12/1954 55
  N6   0-6-2T 1895 LDECR LNER     09/1895 10/1938 18
Robinson O4 GCR class '8K' 2-8-0 1911 GCR LNER   63570 - 63920 09/1911 17/04/1966 402
Robinson O5 GCR class '8M' 2-8-0 1918 GCR LNER     01/1918 06/06/1965 19
Robinson Q4 GCR class '8A' 0-8-0 1902 GCR LNER 5F 63200 - 63243 1902 15/09/1959 89
Robinson S1 GCR class '8H' 0-8-4T 1907 GCR LNER 7F 69900 - 69905 12/1907 01/1957 6
  Y2 MSLR class '4' 0-4-0ST 1883 MSLR LNER   6460 - 6461 03/1883 08/07/1931 2