Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1028 Today
» 1236 Yesterday
» 5999 Week
» 20576 Month
» 383821 Year
» 460408 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Classes of the Caledonian Railway

Designer Class Pre Grouping Class Wheels Year Pre Grouping Big 4 BR Power Class Number Range First Last # Thumbnail
McIntosh Standard Passenger CR class 'Standard Passenger' 0-4-4T   CR LMS   55159 - 55236 03/1900 29/12/1962 76
McIntosh 3F CR class '3F' 0-6-0T   CR LMS   56230 - 56376 04/1895 29/12/1962 147
McIntosh 3F CR class '3F' 0-6-0   CR LMS   57550 - 57645 05/1899 11/1963 93
McIntosh Dunalastair IV CR class 'Dunalastair IV' 4-4-0   CR LMS   54438 - 54460 05/1904 08/1958 22
McIntosh Dock CR class 'Dock' 0-6-0T   CR LMS   56151 - 56173 01/1912 02/04/1962 23
McIntosh 2P CR class '2P' 0-4-4T   CR LMS   55116 - 55146 08/1895 09/1961 26
McIntosh 2P CR class '2P' 0-4-4T   CR LMS   55260 - 55269 05/1925 29/12/1962 10
McIntosh Dunalastair IV   4-4-0   CR LMS   54363 01/1908 30/10/1948 1
McIntosh Dunalastair III CR class 'Dunalastair III' 4-4-0   CR LMS   54434 06/1900 17/04/1948 1
Pickersgill 4P   4-6-0   CR LMS   54630 - 54649 07/1925 12/1953 18
Pickersgill 113   4-4-0   CR LMS 3P 54461 - 54476 02/1916 17/12/1962 16
Pickersgill 3F   0-6-0   CR LMS   57684 - 57691 11/1919 11/1963 6
Pickersgill 60   4-6-0   CR LMS   54650 - 54654 11/1916 09/1953 5
Pickersgill 300   0-6-0   CR LMS   57650 - 57682 03/1918 11/1963 24
Pickersgill 72   4-4-0 1920 CR LMS 3P 54477 - 54508 05/1920 01/10/1962 32
Pickersgill 431   0-4-4T   CR LMS   55237 - 55240 08/1922 09/11/1961 4
Pickersgill 944   4-6-2T   CR LMS   55350 - 55361 01/1917 10/1953 10