Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 536 Today
» 1035 Yesterday
» 6961 Week
» 21269 Month
» 284246 Year
» 360833 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Classes of the Great Western Railway

Designer Class Pre Grouping Class Wheels Year Pre Grouping Big 4 BR Power Class Number Range First Last # Thumbnail
  B1 BaR class 'B1' 0-6-2T 1900 BaR GWR   238 - 277 06/1890 04/1951 20
  VR   2-6-2T 1923   GWR   7 - 9 07/1923   3
  15 CambR class '15' 0-6-0 1903 CambR GWR   844 - 896 30/03/1903 10/1954 11
  Unclassified ANDR class 'Unclass' 2-6-2T 1920 ANDR GWR   1205 - 1206 01/1921 01/1956 2
Cameron A TVR class 'A' 0-6-2T 1914 TVR GWR   303 - 440 10/1914 01/08/1957 58
Churchward Star   4-6-0 1907   GWR   4003 - 4062 04/1906 11/1964 73
Churchward 47xx   2-8-0 1919   GWR   4700 - 4708 05/1919 05/1964 9
Churchward County Tank   4-4-2T 1905   GWR   2221 - 2250 09/1905 11/1935 30
Churchward 42xx   2-8-0T 1910   GWR   4200 - 5204 02/1910 08/1965 205
Churchward 1361   0-6-0ST 1910   GWR   1361 - 1365 04/1910 20/11/1962 5
Churchward 45xx   2-6-2T 1906   GWR   4500 - 4574 10/1906 09/1964 75
Churchward 3150   2-6-2T 1906   GWR   3150 - 3190 04/1906 08/1958 41
Churchward 3100/5100   2-6-2T 1903   GWR   5111 - 5148 01/1905 12/1959 40
Churchward 5205   2-8-0T 1923   GWR   5205 - 5264 06/1923 09/1965 0
Churchward Great Bear   4-6-2 1908   GWR   111 - 111 02/1908 13/07/1953 1
Churchward Saint   4-6-0 1902   GWR 4P 2902 - 2989 04/1905 10/1953 77
Churchward 44xx   2-6-2T 1904   GWR   4400 - 4410 10/1904 09/1955 11
Churchward 43xx   2-6-0 1911   GWR   4303 - 9319 06/1911 11/1964 342
Churchward 28xx   2-8-0 1903   GWR   2800 - 3866 06/1903 11/1965 167
Churchward County   4-4-0 1904   GWR     05/1904 11/1933 40
Collett Grange   4-6-0 1936   GWR   6800 - 6879 08/1936 03/12/1965 80
Collett Manor   4-6-0 1938   GWR   7800 - 7829 01/1938 12/1965 30
Collett 58xx   0-4-2T 1933   GWR   5800 - 5819 01/1933 04/1961 20
Collett 54xx   0-6-0PT 1930   GWR   5400 - 5424 11/1931 10/1963 25
Collett 1101   0-4-0T 1926   GWR   1101 - 1106 06/1926 30/01/1960 6
Collett Castle   4-6-0 1923   GWR   100 - 7037 11/08/1923 12/1965 155
Collett 31xx   2-6-2T 1906   GWR   3100 - 3104 12/1938 01/1960 0
Collett 64xx   0-6-0PT 1932   GWR   6400 - 6439 02/1932 12/1964 40
Collett Hall   4-6-0 1928   GWR   4900 - 6958 12/1924 03/12/1965 258
Collett 57xx   0-6-0PT 1929   GWR   3600 - 9799 01/1929 11/1966 863
Collett 74xx   0-6-0PT 1936   GWR   7400 - 7449 07/1936 04/1965 50
Collett King   4-6-0 1927   GWR   6000 - 6029 06/1927 18/12/1962 30
Collett 14xx   0-4-2T 1932   GWR   1400 - 1474 08/1932 05/1965 75
Collett 72xx   2-8-2T 1934   GWR   7200 - 7253 08/1934 06/1965 0
Collett 1366   0-6-0PT 1934   GWR   1366 - 1371 02/1934 11/1964 6
Collett 4575   2-6-2T 1927   GWR   4575 - 5574 02/1927 12/1964 100
Collett 61xx   2-6-2T 1931   GWR   6100 - 6169 04/1931 03/12/1965 70
Collett 81xx   2-6-2T 1938   GWR   8100 - 8109 03/1938 06/1965 0
Collett 56xx   0-6-2T 1924   GWR   5600 - 6699 12/1924 05/1966 200
Collett 5101   2-6-2T 1929   GWR   4100 - 5199 11/1929 18/11/1965 140
Collett 2251   0-6-0 1930   GWR   2200 - 3219 03/1930 06/1965 120
de Glehn De Glehn   4-4-2 1903   GWR   102 - 104     3
Dean 3571   0-4-2T 1895   GWR   3571 - 3580 05/1895 12/1949 10
Dean 2021   0-6-0PT 1897   GWR   2021 - 2160 02/1897 04/1959 110
Dean Bulldog   4-4-0 1899   GWR   3335 - 3455 02/1900 11/1951 121
Dean Badminton   4-4-0 1897   GWR   3292 - 3311 12/1897 05/1931 20
Dean Atbara   4-4-0 1900   GWR         40
Dean Kruger   2-6-0/4-6-0 1899   GWR   2601 - 2610 12/1899 01/1907 10
Dean 39xx   2-6-2T 1907   GWR   3901 - 3920 02/1907   0
Dean Aberdare   2-6-0 1900   GWR   2600 - 2681 04/1901 27/10/1949 81
Dean/Collett Earl/Dukedog   4-4-0 1936   GWR   9000 - 9028 04/1936 10/1960 29
Dean 2721   0-6-0PT 1897   GWR   2721 - 2799 11/1897 11/1950 80
Dean 655   0-6-0ST 1892   GWR         52
Dean Duke   4-4-0 1895   GWR   9054 - 9091 06/1896 07/1951 60
Dean Flower   4-4-0 1908   GWR         20
Dean Bird   4-4-0 1909   GWR     05/1909 11/1951 15
Dean Achilles   4-2-2 1894   GWR   3001 - 3080 03/1894   50
Dunbar 45   0-6-2T 1915 BMJR GWR     08/1915 02/1954 6
Hawksworth 16xx   0-6-0PT 1949   GWR   1600 - 1669 31/10/1949 09/1966 70
Hawksworth County   4-6-0 1945   GWR   1000 - 1029 08/1945 11/1964 30
Hawksworth 94xx   0-6-0PT 1947   GWR   3400 - 9499 02/1947 06/1965 210
Hawksworth 15xx   0-6-0PT 1949   GWR   1500 - 1509 06/1949 12/1963 10
Hawksworth Modified Hall   4-6-0 1944   GWR   6959 - 7929 03/1944 03/12/1965 71
Hurry Riches O3 TVR class 'O3' 0-6-2T 1902 TVR GWR   410 - 411 01/1904 03/1948 2
Hurry Riches S1 RR class 'S1' 0-6-0T 1919 RR GWR   92 - 605 06/1920 06/1954 3
Hurry Riches R RR class 'R' 0-6-2T 1907 RR GWR   30 - 46 12/1907 03/1951 5
Hurry Riches A1 RR class 'A1' 0-6-2T 1914 RR GWR   63 - 70 06/1914 07/1955 8
Hurry Riches O4 TVR class 'O4' 0-6-2T 1907 TVR GWR   200 - 420 04/1907 07/1955 42
Hurry Riches S RR class 'S' 0-6-0T 1908 RR GWR   93 - 611 06/1908 05/1954 4
Hurry Riches P RR class 'P' 0-6-2T 1909 RR GWR   76 - 83 07/1909 05/1955 4
Hurry Riches AP RR class 'AP' 0-6-2T 1909 RR GWR   78 - 81 08/1921 08/1955 4
Hurry Riches A RR class 'A' 0-6-2T 1910 RR GWR   52 - 75 05/1910 07/1955 16
Jenkins M RR class 'M' 0-6-2T 1904 RR GWR   33 - 51 06/1904 02/1951 3